CT HB07205 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require a percentage of the cars, light duty trucks and buses purchased or leased by the state be zero-emission vehicles or zero-emission buses, establish a Connecticut Hydrogen and Electric Automobile Purchase Rebate Program and fund such program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Accessibility Of Electric Vehicles In Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-15HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 427
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 279
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback