CT HB07204 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the electronic transfer of a student's education records when the student transfers school districts.
Title
An Act Concerning The Electronic Transfer Of Student Records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |