CT HB07198 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require any person who uses the title "social worker" to be licensed as a clinical social worker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Social Workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 380 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 AS AMENDED (Y: 111 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-164
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseFile Number 968
2019-05-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 584
2019-05-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-20HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9085
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 559
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 341
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback