CT HB07185 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 507
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify the meaning of "acts with reckless disregard" as used in the statute concerning liability of a political subdivision and its employees, officers and agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Liability Of A Political Subdivision And Its Employees, Officers And Agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 117 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 507
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 780
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 488
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback