CT HB07179 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require the Commissioner of Housing to establish a grant program to support the development of methods and technologies that reduce the average cost of repairing and replacing concrete foundations in this state that have deteriorated due to the presence of pyrrhotite, (2) establish an innovation board to review applications for grants filed as part of such program, (3) appropriate the sum of eight million dollars to fund grants awarded as part of such program, (4) modify the Healthy Homes Fund surcharge, and (5) redefine the term "residential building" as such term applies to various statutes concerning crumbling concrete foundations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Crumbling Concrete Foundations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 352 PASS (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 305 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26SenatePublic Act 19-192
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 680
2019-06-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10500
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 349
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 227
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing 03/08
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback