CT HB07177 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services and the Commissioner of Veterans Affairs to study the mental health needs of veterans and members of the armed forces in this state and the programs and services available to such veterans and members, and make recommendations to state agencies, community organizations and nonprofit entities concerning allocation of resources to address such mental health needs.
Title
An Act Concerning Studies On Mental Health Services For Veterans And Members Of The Armed Forces And On Certain Former Members Of The Armed Forces Discharged Due To Post-traumatic Stress Disorder Or Traumatic Brain Injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | House | File Number 100 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 102 |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |