CT HB07170 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require insurance companies that issue, renew, amend or endorse, and insurance producers who represent insurance companies with respect to, private passenger nonfleet automobile insurance policies to disclose the impact that an applicant's or insured's driving history has on the cost of such a policy when such company or producer issues a quote for the cost of coverage under such a policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Private Passenger Nonfleet Automobile Insurance Policy Quotes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback