CT HB07164 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 463
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 463
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Implementing The Governor's Budget Recommendations For Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 463 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 308 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |