CT HB07161 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow undergraduate students at public institutions of higher education to finish earning their degrees without student loans.
Title
An Act Establishing Finish Line Grants.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Sen. Rick Lopes [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | House | File Number 250 |
2019-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 168 |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |