CT HB07161 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require service providers under 403(b) retirement plans to disclose conflicts of interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Administrators Of Certain Retirement Plans To Disclose Conflicts Of Interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 331 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-20HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-19HousePublic Act 17-142
2017-06-06HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-06HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-06HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-04HouseFile Number 721
2017-05-04HouseSenate Calendar Number 393
2017-05-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-02HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-02HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6509
2017-03-22HouseFile Number 136
2017-03-22HouseHouse Calendar Number 131
2017-03-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-03-22HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-16HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-02-24HousePublic Hearing 03/02
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback