CT HB07157 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 380
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 380
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit local and regional boards of education to offer blended educational opportunities for students and teachers.
Title
An Act Implementing The Proposals Of The Office Of Early Childhood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 380 |
2017-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-29 | House | File Number 292 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 222 |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |