CT HB07156 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the procurement of energy derived from offshore wind.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Procurement Of Energy Derived From Offshore Wind.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 316 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-18SenatePublic Act 19-71
2019-06-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-04SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-14SenateSenate Calendar Number 486
2019-05-14SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-14HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8292
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 192
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 142
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback