CT HB07156 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the procurement of energy derived from offshore wind.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Procurement Of Energy Derived From Offshore Wind.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 192
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 142
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback