CT HB07155 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) define "telesales call", (2) add requirements for electric suppliers regarding telesales calls and face-to-face marketing, to (3) permit the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to order fines, restitution to customers or a combination of fines and restitution, and (4) prohibit the assignment or transfer of customers without prior approval of the authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Consumer Protections For Customers Of Electric Suppliers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseBill Passed Temporarily
2019-06-05HouseHouse Designated House Amendment Schedule A 10292
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 344
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 222
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback