CT HB07140 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require passengers in the back seat to wear seat belts, (2) require motorcycle operators and passengers to wear protective headgear, (3) revise the administration of the operation lifesaver program, (4) permit maintenance vehicles owned and operated by the Department of Transportation to use green, yellow or amber flashing lights, and (5) remove an obsolete provision in the transportation statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Operation Lifesaver Program, Transportation Network Companies, Public Electric Vehicle Charging Stations, The Use Of Colored And Flashing Lights, Road And Bridge Designations, The Issuance Of Removable Windshield Placards, Snow Removal Services Contracts, Reports By The Department Of Transportation And Other Transportation Statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 340 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 359 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25SenatePublic Act 19-161
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 689
2019-06-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10982
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 480
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 305
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback