CT HB07134 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that any consent order entered into by a party and the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, or the commissioner's designee, is not modified or revoked without the consent of the party.
Title
An Act Concerning Consent Orders Entered Into By The Commissioner Of Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Environment |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Environment |
2017-03-29 | House | File Number 289 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 219 |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |