CT HB07112 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 379
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 379
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the amount of unexpended education funds that a town may deposit into a nonlapsing account at the end of each fiscal year from one per cent to two per cent, and to require that any expenditure of funds from such nonlapsing account be authorized by the local board of education and for educational purposes only.
Title
An Act Increasing The Amount A Town May Deposit Into A Nonlapsing Account For Unexpended Education Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 379 |
2019-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | House Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 71 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 64 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |