CT HB07110 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 890
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require boards of education to revise their safe school climate plans to include provisions relating to disruptive or injurious incidents that occur in classrooms, to develop and implement a state-wide school climate survey, and to require the Department of Education to provide assistance to school districts relating to school climate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Resources To Assist School Districts In Improving School Climate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseFile Number 890
2019-05-16HouseHouse Calendar Number 595
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-10HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/22
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback