CT HB07107 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish the theft of waste vegetable oil or animal fats as larceny in the fourth degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Theft Of Waste Vegetable Oil Or Animal Fats.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 426 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 116 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateVetoed by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenatePublic Act 19-138
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed
2019-05-31SenateSenate Calendar Number 649
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-30SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 415
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 267
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-11HousePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback