CT HB07098 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the holder of an in-state transporter's permit for alcoholic liquor that transports alcohol into the state to file a report with the Department of Revenue Services.
Title
An Act Concerning The In-state Transporter's Permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on General Law |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on General Law |
2017-03-30 | House | File Number 324 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 239 |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-21 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |