CT HB07093 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Special Act 19-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To study and develop recommendations to increase employment opportunities for persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Increase Employment Opportunities For Persons With Disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Roll Call Vote 127 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseSpecial Act 19-12
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-17HouseFile Number 910
2019-05-17HouseSenate Calendar Number 521
2019-05-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-15HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8075
2019-03-21HouseFile Number 89
2019-03-21HouseHouse Calendar Number 79
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-21HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-07HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback