CT HB07091 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendation of the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services to prohibit diagnosis with a mental illness or behavioral or emotional disorder from being grounds for a petition regarding a health care professional's inability to practice with reasonable care or safety.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Mental Health And Addiction Services' Recommendations Regarding Revisions To The Professional Assistance Program For Regulated Professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 385 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 307 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 307 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 17-178 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 577 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-06-02 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | File Number 428 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 301 |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-06 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |