CT HB07088 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 341
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow independent institutions of higher education to be exempt from the requirement to apply to the Office of Higher Education for approval of new or modified programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Program Approval At Independent Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 341
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 219
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback