CT HB07085 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - File Number 67
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - File Number 67
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical changes to the statutes concerning government administration and elections.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Technical Revisions To Statutes Concerning Government Administration And Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 67 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 60 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |