CT HB07079 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 340
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 340
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) increase State Historic Preservation Review Board members' terms from one year to three years; (2) decrease the notice period required for notification of a municipal preservation board or a municipality's chief executive officer that a property is nominated to the National Register of Historic Places from sixty days to thirty days; (3) eliminate the requirement that the State Historic Preservation Officer attend municipal hearings regarding nominations to the National Register of Historic Places; and (4) change the board's name from the State Historic Preservation Board to the State Historic Preservation Review Board.
Title
An Act Concerning The Members And Duties Of The State Historic Preservation Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | File Number 340 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 218 |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |