CT HB07077 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 500
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 500
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the minimum balance amount for which a consumer using a gift card may request a cash refund.
Title
An Act Concerning Cash Refunds For The Balance Of A Gift Card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 119 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 48 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 500 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 7648 |
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 65 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 58 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |