CT HB07075 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - File Number 64
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - File Number 64
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the economic development and welfare of the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 64 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 57 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |