CT HB07067 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a housing authority to expand its jurisdiction to include certain high and very high opportunity areas, as determined by the Department of Housing.
Title
An Act Concerning Housing Authority Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 190 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 140 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |