CT HB07051 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Implementing The Governor's Budget Recommendations For General Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | House | Change of Reference to Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |