CT HB07044 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Pretrial Justice Reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 323 PASS (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 312 AS AMENDED (Y: 88 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 312 AS AMENDED (Y: 88 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-19 | House | Public Act 17-145 |
2017-06-06 | House | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 588 |
2017-06-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8351 |
2017-04-24 | House | File Number 695 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 448 |
2017-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |