CT HB07027 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - File Number 249
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Board of Regents for Higher Education to study issues relating to manufacturing and technology in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Post-secondary Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseFile Number 249
2019-04-01HouseHouse Calendar Number 167
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-01HousePublic Hearing 02/05
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback