CT HB07027 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the values upon which the degrees of criminal mischief are based to mirror the values for the same misdemeanor classifications of larceny in the third and fourth degrees, to amend the definition of "peace officer" and to require the Department of Correction to report information concerning the earned risk reduction credit program.
Title
An Act Concerning Risk Reduction Credits, Carry Permits And Parole Officer Access To State Firearms Database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 465 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 282 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 282 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-216 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-30 | Senate | File Number 923 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 628 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8670 |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 688 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 453 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |