CT HB07024 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Senate Calendar Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Senate Calendar Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make revisions on how the Department of Education calculates school and district performance and to require the Commissioner of Education to receive approval from the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education before the department may seek a waiver of the provisions of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act from the federal government.
Title
An Act Concerning Measures For Calculating School And District Performance And Waivers Of Federal Law Sought By The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 296 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | House | Senate Calendar Number 647 |
2015-06-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2015-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8726 |
2015-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8728 |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 687 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 452 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |