CT HB07008 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 865
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the working group on a public-private partnership to recruit businesses to the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Working Group On A Public-private Partnership To Recruit Businesses To Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 73 AS AMENDED (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseFile Number 865
2019-05-09HouseSenate Calendar Number 466
2019-05-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-07HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-07HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7482
2019-04-01HouseFile Number 248
2019-04-01HouseHouse Calendar Number 166
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-14HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback