CT HB07003 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a moratorium on the use of crumb rubber ground covers at municipal and public school playgrounds.
Title
An Act Establishing A Moratorium On The Installation Of Recycled Tire Rubber At Municipal And Public Schools Playgrounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | No Action |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-25 | House | File Number 125 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 103 |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |