CT HB06960 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that state requirements for Medicaid hospital claims processing are consistent with Medicare requirements and that state standards for the electronic health record incentive payment program do not exceed federal standards.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Prescriptions Written By Hospital Resident Physicians And Interns And The Implementation Of Electronic Health Record Standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | File Number 531 |
2015-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 338 |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |