CT HB06943 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for a delay in implementing a property revaluation in certain municipalities.
Title
An Act Delaying A Municipal Tax Revaluation Deadline And Concerning Municipal Reserve Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 439 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 309 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 309 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | House | Public Act 15-229 |
2015-06-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | House | Senate Calendar Number 645 |
2015-06-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7339 |
2015-03-30 | House | File Number 288 |
2015-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 184 |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |