CT HB06939 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow municipalities to establish cultural districts to encourage economic development and promote tourism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Establishment Of Municipal Cultural Districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 410 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 168 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-143
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseFile Number 981
2019-05-23HouseSenate Calendar Number 594
2019-05-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-21HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8703
2019-04-10HouseFile Number 575
2019-04-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 348
2019-04-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-26HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-22HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-20HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/13
2019-02-06HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback