CT HB06932 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - File Number 718
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the rate of the credit refund value for research and experimental expenditures or research and development expenses of biotechnology companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Rate Of The Credit Refund Value For Certain Expenditures By Biotechnology Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-19 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HouseFile Number 718
2023-05-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 476
2023-05-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-05-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/03/23 5:00 PM
2023-04-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-19HouseJoint Favorable
2023-04-10HousePublic Hearing 04/14
2023-04-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback