CT HB06923 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To ensure per diem compensation equity for state board of mediation and arbitration arbitrators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Per Diem Equity For State Board Of Mediation And Arbitration Arbitrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 405
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 257
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-18HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback