CT HB06921 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit discrimination based on a person's criminal history.
Title
An Act Establishing A Council On The Collateral Consequences Of A Criminal Record.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 411 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 175 AS AMENDED (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 175 AS AMENDED (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-142 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-05-24 | House | File Number 991 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 595 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9352 |
2019-05-21 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-05-21 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8536 |
2019-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 476 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 301 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |