CT HB06887 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) permit a sentence of life imprisonment without the possibility of release for those who commit murder in the course of a family violence crime, (2) prohibit the Board of Pardons and Paroles from taking any action in matters involving a conviction for murder with special circumstances, (3) provide for state-wide expansion of the electronic monitoring program for those who violate restraining orders and protective orders, (4) require the Victim Services Unit of the Department of Correction to provide certain information to enhance the safety of persons protected under court orders, and (5) ensure meaningful participation by the Office of the Victim Advocate on behalf of a victim of domestic violence in court proceedings relating to the acts of domestic violence.
Title
An Act Concerning Additional Legal Protections For Victims Of Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] | Rep. Devin Carney [R] |
Rep. Rick Hayes [R] | Rep. Chris Aniskovich [R] | Rep. Antonio Felipe [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-02 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-13 | House | File Number 593 |
2023-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 364 |
2023-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |