CT HB06885 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase Medicaid payment rates for services provided by individual, fee-for-service providers and emergency medical transportation providers to Medicare rates for the same services and require a study of Medicaid payment rates for certain long-term acute care hospitals and methadone maintenance providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Medicaid Payment Rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24HouseFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-23HouseFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-23HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-21HouseJoint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
2023-03-10HousePublic Hearing 03/16
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback