CT HB06884 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Department of Public Health's recommendations concerning childhood lead poisoning prevention and control.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Childhood Lead Poisoning Prevention And Control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 420 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 129 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 129 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Act 15-172 |
2015-06-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 552 |
2015-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2015-04-15 | House | File Number 651 |
2015-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 410 |
2015-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |