CT HB06881 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) exclude mandated trainings from professional development programs for paraeducators, (2) include a paraeducator on professional development and evaluation committees, (3) require the collection of data concerning paraeducators on the state-wide public school information system, (4) require an annual report on paraeducator staffing levels, (5) require paraeducators to review a student's individualized education program with a supervisor, as needed, (6) require the establishment of a grant program to supplement teacher and paraeducator salaries, (7) establish a minimum salary for teachers and paraeducators, (8) require boards of education to (A) offer the Municipal Employee Health Insurance Plan to paraeducators, and (B) pay the employee contribution required under a retirement system for paraeducators, and (9) require the state to pay not less than fifty per cent of the cost to boards of education for providing the Municipal Employee Health Insurance Plan and for paying the employee contribution for retirement benefits.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To The Education Statutes Related To Educator Compensation And Paraeducators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-27 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-24 | House | Change of Reference Appropriations |
2023-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |