CT HB06873 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Police Officer Standards and Training Council to develop and promulgate a model policy requiring the use of a seat safety belt for any person who is being transported in a municipal police vehicle and create a process for addressing an alleged violation of such policy.
Title
An Act Requiring The Police Officer Standards And Training Council To Develop And Promulgate A Model Policy Requiring The Use Of A Seat Safety Belt For Any Person Who Is Being Transported In A Municipal Police Vehicle.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Anne Hughes [D] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 400 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 60 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 60 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | House | Public Act 23-87 |
2023-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-08 | Senate | File Number 755 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 462 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7070 |
2023-04-18 | House | File Number 652 |
2023-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 420 |
2023-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |