CT HB06872 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Senate Calendar Number 546
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Senate Calendar Number 546
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reimburse workers' compensation claimants who are noticed to appear at a deposition during their regular workday for any lost wages.
Title
An Act Concerning Reimbursement Of Wages And Deposition Appearances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 113 (Y: 79 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 112 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 65 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 112 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 65 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | Senate Calendar Number 546 |
2015-05-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6714 |
2015-03-26 | House | File Number 236 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 167 |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |