CT HB06861 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the task force to study the state workforce and retiring employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Adopting The Recommendations Of The Task Force To Study The State Workforce And Retiring Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2023-05-09HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2023-05-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-08HouseJoint Favorable
2023-05-03HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2023-04-11HouseFile Number 490
2023-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 318
2023-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM
2023-03-24HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-23HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-03-03HousePublic Hearing 03/09
2023-03-02HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback