CT HB06856 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Social Services to transfer sufficient funding to the United Way of Connecticut to operate the 2-1-1 Infoline twenty-four hours a day, seven days a week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The 2-1-1 Infoline System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06HouseFile Number 479
2023-04-06HouseHouse Calendar Number 305
2023-04-06HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-06HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-31HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-23HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-03-03HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2023-03-02HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback