CT HB06847 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 285
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 285
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the chairperson of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to conduct a study regarding the use of technology in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Technology In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | File Number 285 |
2023-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 194 |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |